Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. Alessi & Koenig, LLC et al

Defendant: Hometown Ovation Owners Association, SFR Investments, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00164
Filed: January 30, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 6, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 30, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 41 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 24, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal (ECF No. 50 )is DENIED. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. Alessi & Koenig, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hometown Ovation Owners Association
Represented By: Ryan Kerbow
Represented By: Huong X. Lam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Kerbow
Represented By: Huong X. Lam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin D. Petiprin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]