Casas v. Allred et al

Defendant: Brian E. Williams, Green and Allred
Plaintiff: Daniel Casas
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00175
Filed: February 1, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER Granting Defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 28, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER RE: Informal Settlement Discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Extend Stay re 2 Screening Order. The temporary stay is extened until 6/28/2013. The report by the Attorney General shall be filed no later than that date. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 5, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall SEND a copy of this Order to the Finance Division of the Clerks Office. The Clerk shall also SEND a copy of this Order to t he attention of the Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections. The Clerk shall electronically SERVE a copy of this Order and a copy of Plaintiffs Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, atten tion Kat Howe. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this Order, the Attorney General shall file a notice advising the court and plaintiff of: (a) the names of the defendants for whom it accepts service; (b) the names of the defendants for whom it does not accept service, and (c) the names of the defendants for whom it is filing last-known-address information under seal. If the Attorney General accepts service of process for any named defendant(s), such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint within 60 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Casas v. Allred et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allred
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Casas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]