Globul Mogul LLC v. Advanced Data Recovery et al

Defendant: Philadelphia Insurance Companies, Alexandria Noble, Advanced Data Recovery and ADR & Computer Forensics Associates
Plaintiff: Globul Mogul LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00224
Filed: February 7, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Extend Time. Granting 35 Stipulation to Substitute Attorney Elizabeth Ashley in place and stead of Adam R. Webber for Defendant ADR Data Recovery, Inc. Attorney designation deadline: 6/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 20, 2013 51 Featured Case ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Amend Complaint and 47 Renewed Motion to Amend Complaint. Denying without prejudice and moot 13 and 16 Motions to Dismiss. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/27/2013. Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2013. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 12, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER Denying 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Attend Settlement Conference by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 21, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER Granting 67 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Augusta A. Massey as Counsel of Record. Plaintiff shall associate with or designate local counsel in compliance with LR IA 10-1(b) no later than 3/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Globul Mogul LLC v. Advanced Data Recovery et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Insurance Companies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Noble
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Data Recovery
Represented By: Adam R. Webber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADR & Computer Forensics Associates
Represented By: Adam R. Webber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Globul Mogul LLC
Represented By: James McElroy, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]