Hernandez v. Saxon Mortgage Services et al

Defendant: First National Bank of Arizona, LLC, Bank of New York Mellon, Quality Loan Service Corp., Ocwen Loan Services, LLC, MERS, Inc., NovaStar Mortgage, Inc. and Saxon Mortgage Services
Plaintiff: Perla Hernandez
Case Number: 2:2013cv00323
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 5 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 22 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 2, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the portion of the Defendantss Motion 35 that seeks to Quash the Summons for Improper Service Against Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is DE NIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of the Defendants' Motion 35 that seeks to Quash the Summons for Improper Service Against Counsel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 3, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 13, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Saxon Mortgage Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Arizona, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Daniel S Ivie
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Represented By: Christopher M Hunter
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Represented By: Daniel S Ivie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S Ivie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NovaStar Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S Ivie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perla Hernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]