Fish et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, AAA Northern California, Nevada, Utah and Western United Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sean L Fish and Dawn Fish
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00326
Filed: February 27, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER Denying 7 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 3, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER re 31 Emergency MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Western United Insurance Company. Response due by noon on 12/4/2013. Reply due by noon on 12/5/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2013 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 10, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER STRIKING 36 Notice of Appearance filed by Sean L Fish and Dawn Fish. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 11, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER re 31 Emergency MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Western United Insurance Company and 41 Stipulation filed by Western United Insurance Company. The court issues this order so that all counsel can be prepared to address issues outlined in this order at the 12/13/13 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 13, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER Sanctioning Brock Ohlson, Joseph Wirth, and Bradley Mainor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 26, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER Granting 52 Emergency Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 27, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER that Brock Ohlson, Joseph Wirth and Bradley Mainor shall pay Defendant Liberty Mutual $425 and Defendant Western United $315 in attorney's fees no later than January 31, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fish et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Casey G. Perkins
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Northern California, Nevada, Utah
Represented By: Nathan Reinmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western United Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan Reinmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean L Fish
Represented By: Joseph J. Wirth
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Fish
Represented By: Joseph J. Wirth
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]