Ross v. Krueger et al

Defendant: Greg Arms, Anthony Demeo, Danny Ellis, Scott Gutheridge, Amy Krueger, Richard Marshall, Danita Rainsville, Ricardo Ramerez, Terry Rising, Carina Skyles, Karyn Smith, Melissa Taylor, Shirley Trummell, Brian Young and Jadey Zaragoza
Plaintiff: Jesse Aron Ross
Case Number: 2:2013cv00355
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary Judgment is granted in favor of all Defendants on Counts I and V-VII of the Second Amended Complaint. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Def endants Hollis, Borasky, and Wichman on all claims in their official and individual capacities. Summary Judgment is denied on all other claims. Plaintiff's 98 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 23, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 32 Motion to Extend Copy Work Limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 2, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Nye County Health and Human Services and Nye County Sheriff's Office are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff is given leave to file a Second Amended Complaint by 2/7/2014. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a copy of his 8 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy sent to Plaintiff - SLD)
April 10, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 76 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Court Order Service Upon Newly Added Defendants by US Marshals Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 1, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 87 Plaintiff's First Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Second Motion to Extend Copy Work Limit. Response due by 8/8/2014. Plaintiff's copy work limit shall be extended from $375.10 to $425.10. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Krueger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Demeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gutheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danita Rainsville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Ramerez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Rising
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carina Skyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Trummell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jadey Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Aron Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]