Torres v. Deutsche Bank AG et al

Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG, Loop Capital Markets, LLP and Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Jesus B. Torres
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00363
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER THAT 10 Motion to Quash Service and Dismiss the Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. Service of the summons and complaint on Defendant Loop Capital Markets LLC is quashed pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 2, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER that 6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until July 15, 2013, to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies described above. Failure to do so by this deadline will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 18, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER denying 30 Motion for reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Torres v. Deutsche Bank AG et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets, LLP
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Represented By: Daniel S Ivie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus B. Torres
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]