Galindo-Martinez v. State of Nevada et al

Defendant: NDOC Director Cox, Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto, I. Baca and State of Nevada
Plaintiff: Johnny Galindo-Martinez
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00367
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Informal Settlement Discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Amended Complaint and this Order to Defendants' Counsel - AC)
January 28, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That the stay previously entered herein is lifted and that, within 21 days of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice.If the Attorney General accepts service of process for any named defendant(s), such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the remaining claims 60 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 12, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 06/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 12, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 25 Plaintiff's Motion/Letter to Defendants to Reconsider Settlement Negotiations. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 06/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Galindo-Martinez v. State of Nevada et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC Director Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Baca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Galindo-Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]