Parker v. Western Flyer Express, Inc. et al

Defendant: Western Flyer Express, Inc. and Transport Leasing/Contract, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jerry Parker
Case Number: 2:2013cv00377
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk of the Court for reassignment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the ENE session set for 07/11/2013 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 05/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 41 Defendants' Motion to Reschedule the ENE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all counsel of record who will be participating in the trial of this case, all parties appearing pro se, if any, and all indi vidual parties must be present in person. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 9/20/2013 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. The written evaluation statements shall be submitted directly to chambers - Room 3014 - not later than Friday, 09/13/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 08/01/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 17, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall have until 10/25/2013, in which to either retain new counsel who shall file a notice of appearance in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice or to file a statement that he will proceed pro se, that is represent himself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 09/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 22, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 54 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. All parties shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Western Flyer Express, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Flyer Express, Inc.
Represented By: F. Thomas Edwards
Represented By: Kevin R Donelson
Represented By: Kelsie M Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Leasing/Contract, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsie M Sullivan
Represented By: F. Thomas Edwards
Represented By: Kevin R Donelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Parker
Represented By: Rebekah L Baumgardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]