Islas v. US Bank Trust National Association

Plaintiff: Francisco Islas
Defendant: US Bank Trust National Association
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00379
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 21 Motion to Compel. All existing discovery plan and scheduling order deadlines are stayed until 3/4/2014. Plaintiff shall have until 3/4/2014 in which to retain substitute counsel or file a statement with the court indicating he will be appearing pro se. Status hearing set for 3/25/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 15 days to file an Amended Complaint. Defendant's 7 Motion to Expunge Fugitive "Affidavit or Fact" from th e County Records is Granted. The Affidavit of Fact recorded by the plaintiff regarding the property located at 4725 South Pearl Street, Las Vegas, NV 89121, is CANCELLED and EXPUNGED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 6, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this matter is Dismissed with prejudice and closed. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Islas v. US Bank Trust National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Islas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust National Association
Represented By: Joseph T. Prete
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]