Jenkins v. Laboratory Corporaiton of America

Defendant: Laboratory Corporaiton of America
Plaintiff: Kevin Jenkins
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00409
Filed: March 11, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Reply to 21 Response by 3/6/2014 addressing the issues raised in the Response. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 7, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER re Plaintiff's 20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 20, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint and shall issue Summons. Pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service must be accomplished within 120 days from the date this order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: USM - SLR)
October 3, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting 8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Laboratory Corporation of America answer due 11/4/2013. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jenkins v. Laboratory Corporaiton of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporaiton of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jenkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]