Bonavito v. Nevada Property 1 LLC

Defendant: Nevada Property 1 LLC
Plaintiff: Peter Bonavito
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00417
Filed: March 12, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 21, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Defendant's Counter-Motion to Set Aside Default and 10 Clerk's Entry of Default is SET ASIDE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Response to Default Judgment is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 11, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 28, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 01/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 2, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Punitive Damages Claims, and the punitive damages allegations are hereby stricken. Amended Complaint due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bonavito v. Nevada Property 1 LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Property 1 LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Bonavito
Represented By: Avonte Campinha-Bacote
Represented By: David D. Kheel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]