Pacchiega v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. et al

Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Plaintiff: Fernando Pacchiega
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00478
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER that 13 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendant Goldman, Sachs & Co. is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against Goldman are dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 28, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER that 15 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 5, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER that 20 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 24 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 18 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment consistent with this order and close this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER Denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 28 Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 01/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pacchiega v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Pacchiega
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]