Cummings v. United Healthcare Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Angela Cummings
Defendant: RaeJohne Foster, UHS of Delaware, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. and Valley Health System, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00479
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss. The Title VII race discrimination claim is dismissed; The 42 U.S.C. 1981 claim is dismissed; the negligent training and supervision claim is dismissed; the claim for injunctive relief is dismissed and UHS is dismissed from the case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 21, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 Status Report. The rebuttal expert deadline is extended to 5/9/2014 with all other discovery deadlines to remain the same pursuant to the Court's 40 Order. Discovery will close 5/19/2014. Defendant agrees that Plaintiff will have until 6/8/2014 to depose Defendant's rebuttal expert, if one is retained in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 16, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' 55 Motion for Summary Judgment on the Pleadings and Denying Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.The parties will have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to file dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 30, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation to Extend Time. The Plaintiff shall have through and including 5/11/15 to respond to 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Defendants shall have through and including 5/20/15 to respond to 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings v. United Healthcare Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cummings
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RaeJohne Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHS of Delaware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Health System, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.