Kirkland v. Ballys

Plaintiff: Daniel Kirkland
Defendant: Ballys
Case Number: 2:2013cv00499
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Case for Failure to Prosecute. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 10, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the Complaint. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have until 5/8/13 to file his amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 6, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 5 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs Title VII retaliation claim and 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claim in the Amended Complaint are DISMISSED. Plaintiffs Title VII discrimination claim as the only surviving claim. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkland v. Ballys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kirkland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]