Avello v. Colvin

Plaintiff: William E. Avello
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00504
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER Granting 12 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall refund any filing fee Plaintiff previously tendered in this case. Denying as moot 2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The C lerk of the Court shall file the Complaint. Defendants shall have 60 days from the date of service to file their answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint in this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Finance - SLR)
November 12, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Extend Time. Motions due by 12/9/2013. Cross-Motion due by 1/8/2014. Replies due by 1/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 8, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 32 Motion and 34 Motion. Responses due by 3/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 11, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER Granting Defendant's 39 Amended Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time re 35 Memorandum. Responses due by 4/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Avello v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Avello
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]