7912 Limbwood Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: Republic Services, Inc., Sonya D Newton, MTC Financial, Inc. and Sandra J Newton
702) 629-7925 (fax: 7912 Limbwood Court Trust
702) 946-1345 (fax: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00506
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 99 Motion to Withdraw Association of Counsel by Akerman LLP for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 4, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall appear on Thursday, April 18, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7C, in the United States District Court, District of Nevada, located at 333 S. Las Vegas Blvd., Las Vegas, Nevada, 89101, for a hearing on Plaintif f 7912 Limbwood Court Trust's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #1-5) and the Nevada state court's Order to Show Cause Why Sale Should not be Set Aside (Doc. #1-6). FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit simultaneous briefs on or before Thursday, April 11, 2013, regarding whether this Court has jurisdiction over this action given removal on diversity grounds where two of the Defendants are Nevada residents. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 28, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 Defendant MTC Financial Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Judgment is entered in favor of MTC Financial Inc. and against Plaintiff 7912 Limbwood Court Trust. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Cor poration and Wells Fargo Bank, NA's Joinder is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, NA's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 48 Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 5, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order on the Attorney General for the State of Nevada, certified return receipt requested, at each of the addresses listed in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall forthwith serve a copy of this Order upon the Attorney General for the State of Nevada. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 12, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall appear on Monday, May 19, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7C for a hearing on the parties' positions on whether the Court ought to stay this matter pending a decision by the Nevada Supreme Court in Vil la Palms Court 102 Trust v. Riley and SFR Investments Pool 1 v. US Bank, N.A., both argued before the Nevada Supreme Court sitting en banc on May 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 14, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 27, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the litigation and discovery in the above-captioned matter shall be temporarily stayed until a ruling by the Supreme Court of Nevada on the effect, if any, a homeowners association foreclosure sale has on a first deed of trust; FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants, together with any of their affiliates, agents, and employees, will not assert ownership, transfer, and/or foreclose upon the subject property -- 7912 Limbwood Court, Las Vegas, NV 89131 (the "Property") -- during the pendency of this stay, or without further order of this Court; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff will not sell, transfer, assign, encumber, or otherwise attempt to dispossess any interest in the Property during the pendency of this stay, or witho ut further order of this Court; and FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and will automatically be reopened upon lifting of the stay; FINALLY ORDERED that all pending deadlines in this matter are stayed until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 23, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 88 Motion to Lift Stay is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment they deem appropriate within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 19, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for reassignment. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 7912 Limbwood Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya D Newton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Reynolds
Represented By: Michael E Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra J Newton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 629-7925 (fax: 7912 Limbwood Court Trust
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 946-1345 (fax: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]