Alfred v. Gillispie et al

Plaintiff: William Lloyd Alfred, Jr/
Defendant: Dough E. Gillispie and Metro Police Department
Case Number: 2:2013cv00519
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in its entirety Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's 10 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that count two of plaintiff William Alfred's 9 amended complaint is Stricken. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting a Motion Hearing for 4/18/2013 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach re 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Lloyd Alfred, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 6, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's 25 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint is Dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 14, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in it's entirety 4 Report and Recommendation. The clerk of the court shall file the complaint. All of plaintiffs claims except for his claim for unlawful arrest in violation of the Fourth Amendment are DISMISSED. Plainti ffs claim for double jeopardy is dismissed with prejudice. All other dismissed claims are without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court Shall Strike 6 Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfred v. Gillispie et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lloyd Alfred, Jr/
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dough E. Gillispie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]