Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association et al v. Alumifax, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association-International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada Local 720 Apprentice and Journeyman, Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture machine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Pension Trust and Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Mahine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Wage Disability Trust
Defendant: Advanced Entertainment Services, Inc.,, Alumifax, Inc., Donald Dillingham, Matthew Dillingham and Karen Edmundson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00530
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without Prejudice 17 Ex Parte Motion For Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 28, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendants Donald Dillingham and Karen Edmundson without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 11, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/14/2014 10:15 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Counsel shall call the Court conference line at 702-868-4906 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. The confere nce code is 123456. In order to ensure a clear recording of the hearing, the call must be made using a land line phone. Cell phone calls, as well as the use of a speaker phone, are prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/11/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 13, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 26 Stipulation for Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association et al v. Alumifax, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association-International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada Local 720 Apprentice and Journeyman
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Shannon Gallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture machine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Pension Trust
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Shannon Gallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Nevada Resort Association International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Mahine Operators of the United States and Canada, Local 720, Wage Disability Trust
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Shannon Gallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Entertainment Services, Inc.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alumifax, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Dillingham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Dillingham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Edmundson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]