Hood v. Wyeth LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mary Hood
Defendant: UCB GMBH, Pfizer, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Schwarz Pharma AG, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Alaven Pharmaceutical, LLC, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Mutual Pharmaceutical Company, Inc., Schwarz Pharma, Inc., Wockhardt USA, LLC, Wyeth LLC and Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00531
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 71 Featured Case ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Stay and a temporary stay until 6/25/13 is entered to allow counsel for Plaintiff an opportunity to locate Plaintiff who shall have until 6/25/13 to retain substitute counsel if she wishes to proceed. The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record 65 is GRANTED effective 6/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 7, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 69 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 9, 2013 73 Featured Case ORDER Granting 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Terese A. Drew filed by Mutual Pharmaceutical Company, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hood v. Wyeth LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hood
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCB GMBH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Ryan
Represented By: Natalie J. Kussart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaven Pharmaceutical, LLC
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Greg W. Marsh
Represented By: Curtis Busby
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: David A. Schott
Represented By: Scott D. Bjorseth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Pharmaceutical Company, Inc.
Represented By: Terese A. Drew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt USA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]