Well Care Pharmacy II, LLC v. W' Care, LLC et al

Defendant: Ahunna C. Okoye, John I. Okoye and W' Care, LLC
Counter Claimant: John I. Okoye, Ahunna C. Okoye and W' Care, LLC
Counter Defendant: Well Care Pharmacy II, LLC
Plaintiff: Well Care Pharmacy II, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00540
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk of Court for random reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 6, 2013 29 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER as amended, pages 4 -5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 6, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this order with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 24, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER that 6 , 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Well Care Pharmacy II, LLC shall post a bond of TWENTY THOUSAND DOLLARS ($20,000.00) in order to recompense Defendants if the Court later determines that Defendants have been wrongfully enjoined. FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/24/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Well Care Pharmacy II, LLC v. W' Care, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahunna C. Okoye
Represented By: Robert W. Hernquist
Represented By: John M. Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John I. Okoye
Represented By: Robert W. Hernquist
Represented By: John M. Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W' Care, LLC
Represented By: Robert W. Hernquist
Represented By: John M. Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: John I. Okoye
Represented By: John M. Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ahunna C. Okoye
Represented By: John M. Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: W' Care, LLC
Represented By: John M. Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Well Care Pharmacy II, LLC
Represented By: Joseph S. Kistler
Represented By: Jessica Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Well Care Pharmacy II, LLC
Represented By: Joseph S. Kistler
Represented By: Jessica Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]