Nelson v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joann Nelson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00546
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Howard Roitman is substituted in place and stead of Mark L. Jackson and Paul W VanDerwerken for plaintiff Joann Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/11/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 17, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 24 MOTION to Extend Time Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED. The following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 6/23/2014. Motions due by 7/23/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 10, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 37 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela L. McGaha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Nelson
Represented By: Paul W VanDerwerken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]