John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Jacobs et al

Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Defendant: Kristine Lee Jacobs, guardian of Brian C. Wood, a minor, Kristine Lee Jacobs, Duane Jacobsen and Gina Neff
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00557
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Allowing Interpleader and Denying 10 Defendant's Motion for Declaratory Judgment without prejudice. Hancock shall interplead the Proceeds to the Court. Hancock's requests to be discharged and released from liability and for attorney's fees and costs are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 08/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 13, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Renewed Motion for Discharge. The Court Awards Plaintiff John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) $10,502.39 in attorney's fees and costs. The Court Dismisses Defendant Kristine Lee Jacobs Counterclaim, and dismisses Hancock from this action. The Court also enjoins Defendants from bringing any future lawsuit against Hancock relating to the Proceeds. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 14, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Submission of Qualifications are by 2/24/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 7, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall issue immediate payment from the proceeds currently on deposit in the court's registry in the total amount of $10,502.39 to John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) c/o Daniel P. Kiefer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
July 8, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Jacobs et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Represented By: Daniel P. Kiefer
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Lee Jacobs, guardian of Brian C. Wood, a minor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Lee Jacobs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Jacobsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Neff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]