Acosta v. Ageless Men's Health

Plaintiff: Kathryn Acosta
Defendant: Ageless Men's Health
Case Number: 2:2013cv00588
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 15 Motion to Extend Deadlines is GRANTED. The following deadlines shall apply in this case: Discovery due by 3/14/2014. Motions due by 4/13/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 18 replaced on 12/19/2013) (MMM).
July 9, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Extend Time. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/29/2014. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
February 13, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Main Document 36 replaced on 2/13/2015) (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Ageless Men's Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Acosta
Represented By: Kathleen J England
Represented By: Melanie A Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ageless Men's Health
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.