Contreras v. Fox et al

Defendant: James Kenyon, Ronald D. Fox, Patricia Doninger, Clark County Nevada and State of Nevada
Plaintiff: Monica Contreras
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00591
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER that 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of Nevada is moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 19, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER Granting 53 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the publication of this order in which to file the proposed amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be filed n o later then 1/17/2014. Responses due 1/27/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 46 Plaintiff's First Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Defendant Patricia Doninger's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED with out prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Defendant Clark County's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 Plaintiff's motion to file a sur-reply is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 13, 2014 80 Featured Case ORDER that 65 and 66 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Contreras v. Fox et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kenyon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Fox
Represented By: Eva Garcia-Mendoza
Represented By: Luther Snavely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Doninger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Represented By: C. Wayne Howle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Contreras
Represented By: Ross C Goodman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]