Pappas v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al

Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, M Nolan and W Stockdale
Plaintiff: George C Pappas
Case Number: 2:2013cv00607
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing is set for 10/29/2013 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Plaintiffs counsel shall serve this order on Plaintiff no later than 10/18/2013, and to file a proof of service with the Court no later than 10/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 25, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Amanda N. Connor withdrawn from the case as to Plaintiff. The hearing scheduled for 10/29/2013 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall ass the last known address of Plaintiff to the docket and serve Plaintiff with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Plaintiff - EDS)
October 29, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion and Opposition to 26 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 23, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 21, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding as moot 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Granting 34 Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. All of Plaintiff's claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice and judgment is entered on behalf of Defendants. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 9, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pappas v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Nolan
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Stockdale
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George C Pappas
Represented By: Amanda N. Connor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]