Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Gene Collins

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust, Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Vacation Trust and Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust
Defendant: Gene Collins
Case Number: 2:2013cv00609
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter JUDGMENT against Defendant Gene Collins, an individual doing business as Southern Nevada Flaggers & Barricades, in favor of the Plaintiffs in the amount of $17,254.00, representing attorneys fees and audit costs. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 29, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Gene Collins' 28 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 13, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Gene Collins' 36 Objection to 34 Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Gene Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Vacation Trust
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]