Weeks-Anderegg v. United States of America, et al

Defendant: United States of America, Civil Air Patrol Foundation, Inc. and Kathrynne Alexine McPherson
Plaintiff: Frances M Weeks-Anderegg
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00610
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER Granting 13 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Replies to 10 Objection to Document, Plaintiff's Opposition to 11 Response to Motion, and Plaintiff's Opposition to 12 Response to Motion. Replies due by 5/27/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 3, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Extend Time to File Replies to 4 MOTION for Substitution of United States of America as Defendant and 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Replies due by 7/26/2013. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 1, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER Denying 28 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Hearing and Stay Discovery. Counsel must personally appear at Friday's hearing and be prepared to present arguments regarding how this case should proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 8, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The 7 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery is Denied in Part and Granted in Part. The parties shall file a Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 11/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 18, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER Granting 33 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 16, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER that Federal Defendant Kathrynne Alexine McPherson is dismissed from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the United States of America has been substituted as a Federal Defendant in this case. The caption of thi s action shall be amended to reflect the substitution of the United States of America in place of Federal Defendant Kathrynne Alexine McPherson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Weeks-Anderegg v. United States of America, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel D. Hollingsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Air Patrol Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel D. Hollingsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathrynne Alexine McPherson
Represented By: Daniel D. Hollingsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances M Weeks-Anderegg
Represented By: Robert S. Cardenas
Represented By: John L Bertoldo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]