Harfouche v. Stars on Tour, Inc. et al

Defendant: Maroun Abiaad, Youssef Harb, La Vedette Productions, Inc., Joseph Rahi, Stars on Tour, Inc. and Haifa Wehbe
Plaintiff: Elie Harfouche
Case Number: 2:2013cv00615
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Demand for Security of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 26, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 24 Plaintiff's Cross Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 18, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Defendants Maroun Abiaad, La Vedette Productions, Inc., and Stars on Tour, Inc. are DISMISSED with Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that 16 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 Defendant Haifa Wehbe's Motion to Quash Service of Process and to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process is GRANTED as to the Motion to Quash a nd DENIED as to the request to dismiss this action for the insufficient service of process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall STRIKE 35 Elie Harfouche's Certificate of Service upon Defendant Haifa Wehbe. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/18/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 18, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Declining to adopt 48 Report and Recommendation. THE COURT ORDERS that 56 Defendant Joseph Rahi's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 52 Defendant Wehbe's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 2, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 63 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harfouche v. Stars on Tour, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maroun Abiaad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youssef Harb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Vedette Productions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Rahi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stars on Tour, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haifa Wehbe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elie Harfouche
Represented By: Peter Dubowsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]