Claudio et al v. TMX Finance LLC et al

Defendant: TMX Finance of Nevada, LLC, Title Max of Georgia, Inc., TMX Finance LLC and Title Max of Nevada, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Giltz, Andrew Claudio and Nathan Kimenker
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00620
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER Granting 22 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay. All discovery is stayed in this case until the earlier of 30 days after Defendant files an Answer or 11/12/2013. The parties are not required to file a Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduli ng Order until the earlier of 30 days after Defendant files an Answer or 11/12/2013. After 10/15/2013 the parties may file a motion or stipulation to further stay the Rule 26(f) conference and discovery if the case is still pending and the Defendant has not filed an Answer at the time of filing the new motion or stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 22, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 26 Joint Motion for Further Stay of Rule 26(f) Conference and Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 26, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER Granting 28 Motion for Stay of Rule 26(f) Conference and Discovery Deadlines. All discovery is stayed in this case until the earlier of 20 days after Defendant files an answer or 5/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Claudio et al v. TMX Finance LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX Finance of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title Max of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMX Finance LLC
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Represented By: Barry L Pickens
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Brian J. Christensen
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title Max of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Giltz
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Claudio
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Kimenker
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]