Montes v. Bank of America, NA et al

Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA and Bank of America, NA
Plaintiff: Jose Montes
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00660
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER Granting 6 Bank of America, NA's Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses with prejudice the first, second, and third claims against Bank of America, NA. The Court dismisses with leave to amend the fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, and eighth claims against Bank of America, NA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 7 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA's Motion to Dismiss is Granted. The Court dismisses with prejudice the third claim for unjust enrichment against National Union. The Court dismisses with leave to amend the second, fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, and eighth claims against National Union. Plaintiff has 20 days from the date of this order to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 3, 2014 55 Featured Case ORDER that Montes file a supplement to 35 MOTION to Compel filed by Jose Montes by 4/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 3, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 49 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED that 25 Jose Montes' Motion to Add Parties is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 15, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER Denying 43 Motion to Reconsider. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 33 and 34 Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED. Claims two through six are dismissed with prejudice. The seventh and eighth claims are dismissed with limited leave to amend within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Montes v. Bank of America, NA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA
Represented By: Kristin E. Meredith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Kristin E. Meredith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Montes
Represented By: Patrick McKnight
Represented By: Theodore P. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]