Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada et al v. Kirkwood Stone Tile & Carpet, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada, Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund and Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
Defendant: Robert J Kirkwood and Kirkwood Stone Tile & Carpet, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00661
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Fun
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER Granting 9 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants Kirkwood Stone Time & Carpet, Inc., and Robert J. Kirkwood, jointly and severally in the amount of $19,755.51. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 17, 2013 11 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants Kirkwood Stone Tile & Carpet, Inc. and Robert J Kirkwood, jointly and severally, in the total judgment amount of $19,755.51. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 1, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER that a bench warrant for the arrest of Robert Kirkwood shall issue and shall be served by the United States Marshals Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 20, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Vacate 20 Order to Show Cause and 24 Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 23 Bench Warrant is QUASHED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for attorney's fees and costs as a sanction is considered WITHDRAWN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc U.S. Marshal - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada et al v. Kirkwood Stone Tile & Carpet, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Kirkwood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkwood Stone Tile & Carpet, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]