Benson v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al

Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy International Limited and Precision Instruments, Inc.
Plaintiff: James M Benson
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00713
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 2 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Motion to Remand to State Court is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Motion for Expedited Hearing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2197). Signed by MDL Panel on 8/6/13. (Attachments: # 1 Minute Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2197). Signed by MDL Panel on 08/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Benson v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Instruments, Inc.
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M Benson
Represented By: Eglet Wall
Represented By: Erica D. Entsminger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]