Green v. Moeller et al

Defendant: Pamela C. Sellers and Herman Moeller
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Green
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00739
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment ofthis case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Set Aside 19 Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 3, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing this action without prejudice. Denying as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 31, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Modify the Caption. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Green v. Moeller et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela C. Sellers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Moeller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]