Delisse v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Antoinette Delisse
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00780
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report no later than 4:00 p.m August 8, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 11, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), and the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 Status Report in Removal Case filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until 9/2/2014, to file the Joint Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Delisse v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Wagner
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Delisse
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]