Bond Manufacturing Co. v. Xiamen Hwaart Composite Material Co., Ltd. et al

Defendant: Tina Wu, Jimmy Chen and Xiamen Hwaart Composite Material Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Bond Manufacturing Co.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00812
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/20/2013 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 05/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) Modified on 5/9/2013 (AC).
December 4, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 30 Stipulation Adjourning Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 10, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 58 Motion to Compel. Denying without prejudice 59 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 25, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 76 Report and Recommendation. Granting 72 Motion to Strike 17 Answer to Complaint and 42 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim. Granting 73 Motion to Dismiss. The Counterclaims filed against plaintiff by Xiamen Hwaart Composite Material Co., Ltd., and Jimmy Chen are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond Manufacturing Co. v. Xiamen Hwaart Composite Material Co., Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Wu
Represented By: John D. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Chen
Represented By: John D. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Hwaart Composite Material Co., Ltd.
Represented By: John D. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bond Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Natalie M. Cox
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]