Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada v. Darrell L. Beavers et al

Defendant: Todd Jensen, Ronald Schmidt, Christopher Schenck, Gary F. Robson, Richard L. Reguzzoni, Antonio Quiroz, Philip Clough, Delaney S Meyer, Wayne R. King, Jr., Kevin S. Gavette, Gary Dean, Darrell L. Beavers, Everett L. Comparoni, Brandon Brooks and Shaun E. Upson
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00824
Filed: May 10, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER Granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Granting 28 Motion for Service by Publication. Proof of service due within 90 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 6, 2014 39 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 20 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Antonio Quiroz be Granted in part. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Court award Plaintiffs a total of $11,982 in damages and $1,293 in attorney's fees and costs. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2014 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 27, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER Accepting and Adopting in full the 39 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Default Judgment is Granted in part. Judgment shall be entered against Defendant Antonio Quiroz in the amount of $11,982 in damages and $1,293 in attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 27, 2014 42 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada and against Defendant Antonio Quiroz in the amount of $11,982 in damages and $1,293 in attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 1/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 28, 2014 44 Featured Case ORDER Accepting and Adopting 43 Report and Recommendation in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED in part. Judgment shall be entered in Plaintiff's favor and against Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 28, 2014 45 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada and against Defendant Philip Clough in the amount of $8,964 in damages and $1,982 in attorneys' fees and costs, against D efendant Kevin S. Gavette in the amount of $6,734 in damages and $1,967 in attorneys' fees and costs, against Defendant Christopher Schenck in the amount of $6,153 in damages and $1,959 in attorneys' fees and costs, and against Defendant Shaun E. Upson in the amount of $15,652 in damages and $2,061 in attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 03/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada v. Darrell L. Beavers et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Jensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Schenck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary F. Robson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Reguzzoni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Quiroz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Clough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaney S Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne R. King, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin S. Gavette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell L. Beavers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett L. Comparoni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun E. Upson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]