Zander v. Tropicana Entertainment, Inc.

Defendant: Tropicana Entertainment, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paulette R. Zander
Case Number: 2:2013cv00848
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Second Cause of Action for Res Ipsa Loquitur is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 02/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 15, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 Proposed Order Submission, 28 Stipulation for extension of time. IT IS ORDERED that the joint request to stay discovery is GRANTED. Counsel will be required to submit a Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (if necessary) within 14 days after a decision on the pending dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
December 16, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 21 Motion to Strike; granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiffs proposed Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint 18 , as Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zander v. Tropicana Entertainment, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine F. Parks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette R. Zander
Represented By: Brandon W McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]