Zabelny v. CashCall, Inc.

Defendant: CashCall, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kyle Zabelny
Case Number: 2:2013cv00853
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply re 24 Notice of New Authority re 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 25, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 33 Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply re 6 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. CashCall shall file its response, not to exceed five pages, within five days of the Court's Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 2, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 36 Emergency Motion to Stay is GRANTED. Briefing on 34 Motion for Conditional Certification is STAYED pending the Court's decision on 6 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss and Denying as moot 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Use Exhibits. The parties shall immediately meet and confer to make the arrangements to schedule an arbitration in Orange County, California as expeditiously as possible. This action is DISMISSED, and the clerk of the court shall enter judgment in favor of the Defendant accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/07/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zabelny v. CashCall, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CashCall, Inc.
Represented By: Laura J Thalacker
Represented By: Malani L. Kotchka
Represented By: Justin Carter Johnson
Represented By: Esra Acikalin Hudson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Zabelny
Represented By: David L Langhaim
Represented By: Andrew L Rempfer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]