Lee v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rex Lee
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01052
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Denying 13 Defendant's Motion to Compel as Moot. Each party shall bear their own fees and expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 09/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 18, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER Granting 27 Defendant's Motion for Leave to take Deposition of Person Confined in Prison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 18, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 36 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Each party to bear that party's own costs and attorney's fees. In light of this dismissal, all pending Motions are DENIED as moot and the 12/23/2013 status conference is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Marjan Hajimirzaee
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Lee
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: Joel S Hengstler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]