Portillo v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al

Defendant: John Norman and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
702) 432-4709 (fax: Rebecca Portillo
Case Number: 2:2013cv01109
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant John Norman's 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 19, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Summary judgment is entered in favor of the Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department on all of plaintiff's claims against it. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 29, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 10/14/2014. Failure to timely comply may result in the imposition of sanctions up to and including a recommendation to the District Judge of case dispositive sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portillo v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Norman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 432-4709 (fax: Rebecca Portillo
Represented By: William C. Horne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]