Saintal v. Cox et al

Defendant: Joseph Odells, Chris Nehls, Carolyn Myles, David Molina, Dr. Jim Holmes, Sheryl Foster and James C Cox
Plaintiff: Priscella Saintal
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01293
Filed: July 22, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2014 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, 20% of the preceding months deposits to Plaintiff's account in the months that the account exceeds $10.00. The Attorney Generals Office shall file a notice regarding acceptance of service within 21 days. If the Attorney General accepts servi ce of process for any named defendant(s), such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Finance and Chief of Inmate Services - AC)
April 14, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER Denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; Granting 20 Defendants' Motion to Strike 16 Response; and Denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 10, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED. The clerk is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
November 27, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER RE: INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Saintal v. Cox et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Odells
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Nehls
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Myles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Molina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jim Holmes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscella Saintal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]