Dominguez-Hernandez et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al

Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Sheriff Douglas Gillespie, Officer J Barker and Officer M Purcaro
Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez and Jamileth Dominguez-Hernandez
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01300
Filed: July 22, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER Sealing 1 Complaint and ORDERING the docket be modified to include the minor child's initials only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 19, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER Denying 25 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 4, 2014 35 Featured Case ORDER Discharging 33 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 4, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER Granting 29 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 1, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. All claims against Sheriff Douglas Gillespie are DISMISSED. Plaintiffs have 30 day from the entry of this Order to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 1, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER Lifting Stay of Discovery. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 7, 2014 44 Featured Case ORDER that attorneys Gregory Trachtman, Margaret McLetchie, Craig Anderson, and Tye Hanseen file a certification with the Court no later than August 14, 2014, indicating that they have read and comprehend Local Rules 26-4 and 26-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 14, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Seal 37 and 46 . The Court also orders Defendants' counsel Craig Anderson and Tye Hanseen to read Special Orders Nos. 108 and 109 in their entirety and file a declaration, no later than 8/21/14, indicating they have done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dominguez-Hernandez et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Joshua L Benson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Douglas Gillespie
Represented By: Joshua L Benson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J Barker
Represented By: Joshua L Benson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer M Purcaro
Represented By: Joshua L Benson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez
Represented By: George Trachtman
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamileth Dominguez-Hernandez
Represented By: George Trachtman
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]