Farnum v. LeGrand

Respondent: Attorney General State of Nevada and Warden Robert LeGrand
Petitioner: John Michael Farnum
Case Number: 2:2013cv01304
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Extend Time. Response to the petition shall be filed 45 days of entry of the order deciding the 10 Motion to Disquaify. Respondents shall have 30 days to identify those claims that are purported to be procedural ly defaulted. Petitioner shall have 30 days to rebut the assertion through citation to the state record and to file a waiver of any present or potential conflict of interest with counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 7, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Respondents' 10 Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Petitioner. From this date forward, the hard copy of any exhibits shall be forwarded for this case to the staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 24, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Respondents' 27 Motion to Dismiss is Granted in part with respect to issues 1, 2, 4, 6, 7, and 8. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to do one of the following:inform the court in a sworn declar ation that he wishes to dismiss issues 1, 2, 4, 6, 7, and 8 of his 1 petition and proceed only on the remaining grounds for relief;inform the court in a sworn declaration that he wishes to dismiss his 1 petition to return to state court to e xhaust his state remedies with respect to the claims set out in issues 1, 2, 4, 6, 7, and 8 of his 1 petition;move to stay this action while he returns to state court to exhaust his state remedies with respect to the claims set out in issues 1, 2, 4, 6, 7, and 8 of his 1 petition. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this action (see Order for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 31, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner shall have 20 days from entry of this order to either pay $5 Filing Fee or Submit a Fully Completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 1, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall FILE and ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the petition upon the respondents. Answer due within 45 days. Reply due within 45 days of Answer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farnum v. LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Nevada
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Jared M Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Robert LeGrand
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Jared M Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Michael Farnum
Represented By: Michael H. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]