LN Management LLC Series 8246 Azure Shores v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: Arlene G. Dizon, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and World Savings Bank, FSB
Plaintiff: LN Management LLC Series 8246 Azure Shores
Case Number: 2:2013cv01307
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 14 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 30, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 24, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 26, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 35 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff shall post a bond with the Court in the amount of $1,500.00. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Finance - SLR)
January 29, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Reply to 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 1/28/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 19, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LN Management LLC Series 8246 Azure Shores v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene G. Dizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew D. Dayton
Represented By: Gregory L Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LN Management LLC Series 8246 Azure Shores
Represented By: Kerry P. Faughnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]