Moapa Band of Paiute Indians, et al v. Nevada Power, et al

Defendant: Nevada Power Co and California Department of Water Resources
Plaintiff: Moapa Band of Paiute Indians and Sierra Club
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01417
Filed: August 8, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Resource & Recovery Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER Denying 26 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to File Response to the 1 Complaint without prejudice. Any renewed stipulation to extend this deadline shall be filed no later than 10/08/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 25, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING. Discovery Hearing re 41 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is set for 12/18/2013 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 11, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER Granting 45 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Counsel for Defendant California Department of Water Resources shall call the Court conference line at 702-868-4906 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. The conference code is 123456. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 20, 2014 64 Featured Case ORDER that 59 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer is GRANTED. The amended answer shall be filed and served within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moapa Band of Paiute Indians, et al v. Nevada Power, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Power Co
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Water Resources
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moapa Band of Paiute Indians
Represented By: Charles M. Tebbutt
Represented By: Gloria D Smith
Represented By: Christopher W Mixson
Represented By: Daniel Galpern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Daniel Galpern
Represented By: Christopher W Mixson
Represented By: Gloria D Smith
Represented By: Charles M. Tebbutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]