Manzano v. M.R.S. Associates, Inc.

Defendant: M.R.S. Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Manzano
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01733
Filed: September 23, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Anthony R. Ager withdrawn from the case as Counsel for Defendant MRS Associates, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Each party to bear her/its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 05/01/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 19, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Manzano v. M.R.S. Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R.S. Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Manzano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]