Witt v. Hampton & Hampton et al

Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 8304 Broad Peak LLC, Saticoy Bay LLC, Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC and Hampton & Hampton
Plaintiff: Mark W Witt
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02344
Filed: December 26, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Hampton & Hampton and Hampton & Hampton Collections LLC shall file their Certificate of Interested Parties by 1/21/2014. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 8, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Compel Silverstone Ranch Community Association to Respond to Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum. Silverstone Ranch Community Association's Responses due by 6/9/2014. The Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2014 on Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Compel is Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy of Order mailed to Silverstone Ranch Community Association - SLD)
September 29, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Amend Complaint. Denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint deadline: 10/20/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Witt v. Hampton & Hampton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 8304 Broad Peak LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Represented By: Leslie Nino
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Represented By: Leslie Nino
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W Witt
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]