Grisham v. Eighth Judicial District Family Court et al

Plaintiff: Michael H. Grisham
Defendant: Eighth Judicial District Family Court and Vincent Ochoa
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02349
Filed: December 27, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Responses due by 4/11/2014. Replies due by 4/15/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 16, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 18 Motion to Extend Time to File a Reply to 12 MOTION to Stay During the Pendency of 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 4/18/2014. Defendants' 17 Motion to Strike is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 21, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 12 Motion to Stay All Discovery pending resolution of the Motion for Summary Judgment. In the event that the motion for summary judgment is not granted in full, the parties shall submit a joint status report to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe within 14 days of the issuance of the order resolving the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 29, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' 25 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 5, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 5/9/2014. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 16, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court will construe the 10 Motion for Summary Judgment as a Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. Plaintiff Michael Grisham's Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 29, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 7 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 1 -3 Petition of Temporary Stay. This order is without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a proper motion seeking relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grisham v. Eighth Judicial District Family Court et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael H. Grisham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighth Judicial District Family Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Ochoa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]