Southern Wine & Spirits of America, Inc., v. Price et al

Defendant: Barrique International, LLC, Danielle Price and Michael Price
Unknown: Robert Duane Frizell
Plaintiff: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00388
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the Defendants shall file a Statement regarding removed action by 4/30/2014. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 04/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 4, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 22, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the parties shall have until May 5, 2015, to execute the Settlement and Release Agreement in the form attached as Exhibit A to this order. Defendants shall have until May 19, 2015, in which to deliver a check in the sum of $25,00 0.00 payable to Southern Wine & Spirits, in care of the law firm of Lewis, Roca, Rothgerber LLP. The Defendants shall have until May 19, 2015, in which to deliver a check in the sum of $25,000 payable to the organization of Keep Memory Alive. The parties shall have until May 19, 2015, to file a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, Inc., v. Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrique International, LLC
Represented By: Ketan D Bhirud
Represented By: Paul R. Hejmanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Price
Represented By: Ketan D Bhirud
Represented By: Paul R. Hejmanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Price
Represented By: Ketan D Bhirud
Represented By: Paul R. Hejmanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Wine & Spirits of America, Inc.
Represented By: Ketan D Bhirud
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Represented By: Tara C Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]